EP1267038 - Air cooled aerofoil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bather, Simon 149 Campion Drive, Bradley Stoke Bristol BS32 0EW / GB | 02 /
Jago, Michael John 9 Mount Close, Frampton Cotterell Bristol BS36 2DD / GB | 03 /
Walters, Sean Alan 1 Linden Close Winterbourne, Bristol BS36 1LG / GB | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Bird, Vivian John Rolls-Royce plc, Intellectual Property Dept WH 58, P.O. Box 3, Filton Bristol BS34 7QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Bird, Vivian John Rolls-Royce plc, Intellectual Property Dept WH 58, P.O. Box 3, Filton Bristol BS34 7QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253514.0 | 20.05.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | GB20010014503 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0114503 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1267038 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1267038 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267038 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F05D2230/21 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/38] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gekühltes Schaufelblatt | [2002/51] | English: | Air cooled aerofoil | [2002/51] | French: | Aube refroidie | [2005/41] |
Former [2002/51] | Aube refroidi | Examination procedure | 20.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 24.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1175816 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]US3672787 (THORSTENSON ROLF A) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]GB1285369 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]US3698834 (MEGINNIS GEORGE B) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]GB1489098 (BBC SULZER TURBOMASCHINEN) [X] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]US4768700 (CHEN YU-LIN [US]) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]US5383766 (PRZIREMBEL HANS R [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]US5624231 (OHTOMO FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 20-24 *; | [X]WO9845577 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]EP1001137 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]US6213714 (RHODES JEFFREY F [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]EP1091092 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-4* figure - * |