EP1262953 - Speaker adaptation for speech recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/49] | Speaker and environment adaptation based on linear separation of variability sources | ||
[2005/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rigazio, Luca 165 San Angelo, Apt. G Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | 02 /
Nguyen, Patrick 1117 E. Cota Street Santa Barbara, California 93103 / US | 03 /
Kryze, David 208 Natoma Avenue, No. 2 Santa Barbara, California 93101 / US | 04 /
Junqua, Jean-Claude 4543 Nueces Drive Santa Barbara, California 93110 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Nicholas Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2EN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas Atkinson Burrington Limited 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | ||
Former [2005/16] | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson Burrington Ltd 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | ||
Former [2002/49] | Burrington, Alan Graham Headford, et al Atkinson Burrington 25-29 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253651.0 | 23.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | US20010864838 | 24.05.2001 Original published format: US 864838 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262953 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1262953 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262953 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06, G10L15/20 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G10L15/07 (EP,US);
G10L21/0208 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/49] | G10L15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Title | German: | Sprecheranpassung für die Spracherkennung | [2005/26] | English: | Speaker adaptation for speech recognition | [2005/26] | French: | Adaptation au locuteur pour la reconnaissance de la parole | [2005/26] |
Former [2002/49] | Sprecher- und Umgebungsanpassung auf der Basis linearer Trennung von Variabilitätsquellen | ||
Former [2002/49] | Speaker and environment adaptation based on linear separation of variability sources | ||
Former [2002/49] | Adaptation de locuteur et d'environnement basée sur la séparation linéaire de sources de variabilité | Examination procedure | 11.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 10.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.12.2005 | BE | 07.12.2005 | CH | 07.12.2005 | CY | 07.12.2005 | FI | 07.12.2005 | IT | 07.12.2005 | LI | 07.12.2005 | NL | 07.12.2005 | TR | 07.12.2005 | DK | 07.03.2006 | GR | 07.03.2006 | SE | 07.03.2006 | ES | 18.03.2006 | PT | 08.05.2006 | GB | 23.05.2006 | IE | 23.05.2006 | LU | 23.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IT | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
TR | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
GB | 23.05.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
LU | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IT | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
GB | 23.05.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
GB | 23.05.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
IE | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
BE | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 07.12.2005 | |
CH | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0779609 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 6 * * column 7, line 9 - line 37 *; | [A]US5664059 (ZHAO YUNXIN [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 33 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 42 *; | [A] - SAGAYAMA S ET AL, "Jacobian approach to fast acoustic model adaptation", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), ISBN 0-8186-7919-0, pages 835 - 838, XP010225924 [A] 1,12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.596063 | [PX] - LUCA RIGAZIO ET AL, "Separating speaker and environment variabilities for improved recognition in non-stationary conditions", PROCEEDINGS OF EUROSPEECH 2001, (20010902), vol. 4, page 2347, XP007004861 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * |