EP1282250 - Method of transparently transporting frames with reduced overhead between two networks through an intermediate network using a common frame with expanded payload section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Den Bakker, Roel Naaldaar 21 3892 DM Zeewolde / NL | 02 /
Busschbach, Peter B. 11 Preakness CT Tinton Falls, New Jersey 07724 / US | 03 /
Hulshoff, P. Haarlemplein 11 1324 RT Almere / NL | 04 /
Vissers, Maarten Petrus Joseph Simone de Beauvoirlaan 7 1277 BE Huizen / NL | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2003/06] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limted, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253957.1 | 06.06.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | US20010918385 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: US 918385 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1282250 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1282250 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
H04J3/1611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/43] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum transparenten Transport von Rahmen mit reduziertem Overhead zwischen zwei Netzwerken durch ein Übergangsnetzwerk, das einen gemeinsamen Rahmen mit erweiterter Nutzlast überträgt | [2003/06] | English: | Method of transparently transporting frames with reduced overhead between two networks through an intermediate network using a common frame with expanded payload section | [2003/06] | French: | Procédé de transport transparent de trames avec entête reduit entre deux réseaux à travers un réseau intermédaire utilisant une trame commune avec une charge utile élargie | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9950986 (ALCATEL USA SOURCING LP [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 32 - page 6, line 6 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 16 - line 26 * * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0038362 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 2,6 * page 2, line 12 - line 26 * * page 4, line 1 - line 19 * * page 5, line 23 - line 37 ** page 9, line 8 - line 37 *; | [E]EP1217774 (ALCATEL USA SOURCING LP [US]) [E] 1-8 * column 1, line 20 - line 31 * * column 2, line 33 - line 55 * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 57 * * claims 1-5 * * figure 1 *; | [E]EP1246383 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [E] 1-8 * page 2, line 36 - line 44 * * page 4, line 15 - line 40 * * page 4, line 11 - line 21 * * claims 1-15 * * claims 30,31 * * figure 2 * |