Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
10.07.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
02.07.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.04.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
08.04.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
09.12.2003 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
05.12.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
05.12.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
10.09.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.09.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
16.05.2003 | First examination report | |
15.05.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
27.12.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
27.12.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |