Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3902522B | Global Dossier | 11.04.2007 | B2 | JP2003134174 | 09.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US91838501 | 30.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1282250 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2004 | B1 | EP1282250 | 05.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91838501 | 30.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2389133 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91838501 | 30.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1400782 | 05.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US91838501 | 30.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60201052T | 01.09.2005 | T2 | DE60201052D1 | 30.09.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US91838501 | 30.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7002957 | 21.02.2006 | B2 | US2003021270 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91838501 | 30.07.2001 |