Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
18.12.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
17.12.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.07.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.04.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
03.04.2009 | Change - classification | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
02.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.06.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.06.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.06.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.05.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.11.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
01.11.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |