Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100547105B | Global Dossier | 26.01.2006 | B1 | KR20030010479 | 05.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010034138 | 16.06.2001 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2407816 | 14.04.2009 | C | CA2407816 | 01.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02010127 | 14.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY142281 | 15.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY143728 | 30.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3871123B | Global Dossier | 24.01.2007 | B2 | JP2003100056 | 04.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010034138 | 16.06.2001 | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1267273 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2009 | A3 | EP1267273 | 18.12.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20010034138 | 16.06.2001 | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1193603C | 16.03.2005 | C | CN1392727 | 22.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010034138 | 16.06.2001 | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW564638B | 01.12.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | KR20010034138 | 16.06.2001 | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003086690 | 08.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010034138 | 16.06.2001 | KR20020009744 | 23.02.2002 | KR20010067827 | 01.11.2001 |