EP1271642 - Method for evaluating dependence of properties of semiconductor substrate on plane orientation and semiconductor device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | For all designated states Masuoka, Fujio 2-33-18, Higashikatsuyama, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 981-0923 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states Masuoka, Fujio 2-33-18, Higashikatsuyama, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-0923 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endoh, Tetsuo 8-6, Yurigaoka 5-chome Natori-shi, Miyagi 981-1245 / JP | 02 /
Masuoka, Fujio 2-33-18, Higashikatsuyama, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-0923 / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Noboru 2537-111, Kasuga-cho Fukuyama-shi, Hiroshima 721-0907 / JP | 04 /
Tanigami, Takuji 3-10-301, Kinoshocho 1-chome Fukuyama-shi, Hiroshima 720-0082 / JP | 05 /
Yokoyama, Takashi 17-6, Rokuchonome-Nakamachi, Wakabayashi-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 984-0012 / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254340.9 | 21.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010190277 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001190277 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271642 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271642 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H01L22/12 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2006/23] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Methode zur Evaluierung der Abhängigkeit von Halbleitersubstrat-Eigenschaften von der Kristallorientierung und Halbleiter damit | [2003/01] | English: | Method for evaluating dependence of properties of semiconductor substrate on plane orientation and semiconductor device using the same | [2003/01] | French: | Méthode d'évaluation de la dépendance d'un matériau semi-conductrice de l'orientation cristallographique et dispositif semi-conductrice associée | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 04.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH07283117 ; | [DA]JPH10154810 ; | [X]US4309813 (HULL RICHARD) [X] 10 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4470875 (POTEAT TOMMY L [US]) [X] 7-10 * column 2, line 54 - column 34, line 14; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]EP0618615 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * page 5, line 45 - page 6, line 37; figure 1 *; | [Y] - WOLF S ET AL, "Silicon processing for the VLSI era, volume 1: Process technology", SILICON PROCESSING FOR THE VLSI ERA, LATTICE PRESS, SUNSET BEACH, CA, US, (1986), vol. 1, pages 211 - 213, XP002337036 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07283117 A 19951027 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DX] 10,11 * abstract * | [X] - VANGBO M ET AL, "PRECISE MASK ALIGNMENT TO THE CRYSTALLOGRAPHIC ORIENTATION OF SILICON WAFERS USING WET ANISOTROPIC ETCHING", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS & MICROENGINEERING, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199606), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 0960-1317, pages 279 - 284, XP001028555 [X] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/6/2/011 | [X] - ENSELL G, "Alignment of mask patterns to crystal orientation", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (199605), vol. 53, no. 1, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 345 - 348, XP004018170 [X] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(96)80158-0 | [X] - CHEN P-H ET AL, "PRECISE MASK ALIGNMENT DESIGN TO CRYSTAL ORIENTATION OF (100) SILICON WAFER USING WET ANISOTROPIC ETCHING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (2000), vol. 4174, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 462 - 466, XP001030488 [X] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.396466 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10154810 A 19980609 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * |