EP1270333 - External rear-view mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METAGAL INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO LTDA. Av. Roberto Gordon 333, Vila Mary Diadema Estado de Sao Paulo CEP:09990-090 / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states METAGAL INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO LTDA. Av. Roberto Gordon 333, Vila Mary Diadema Estado de Sao Paulo CEP:09990-090 / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyabukuro, Pedro Takashi Rua das Moncoes no. 326, Apto.61, Bairro Jardim Santo Andre, Est.de Sao Paulo 09090-520 / BR | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 18 South End Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254351.6 | 21.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US20010886866 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: US 886866 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270333 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270333 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/072 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B60R1/072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/21] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aussenrückblickspiegel | [2003/01] | English: | External rear-view mirror | [2003/01] | French: | Rétroviseur extérieur | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4648693 (LOESCH DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5046379 (BROWN WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 15-18 * * figure 3 *; | [X]EP0535993 (BRITAX RAINSFORDS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,5,6 * figure 2 *; | [X]US5604645 (WEAVER JAMES M [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-16 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0860323 (BRITAX GECO SA [FR]) [X] 1,5-7 * figure 8 *; | [X]DE19902757 (BUHLER MOTOR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * column 1, lines 3-14 * * column 3, lines 62-65 ** figures 3,4 *; | [X]US6168279 (SCHNELL ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * column 4, lines 23-26 * * figures 1,4 * |