EP1279627 - Article conveyor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANKYO MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LTD. 37-3, Tabatashinmachi-3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states SANKYO MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LTD. 37-3, Tabatashinmachi-3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Heizaburo 1434-1, Hansei, Kikukawa-cho Ogasa-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254566.9 | 28.06.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | JP20010222042 | 23.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001222042 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279627 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279627 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65G27/02, B65G27/12 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B65G27/02 (EP,US);
B23Q7/00 (KR);
B65G27/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/42] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fördervorrichtung für Gegenstände | [2003/05] | English: | Article conveyor device | [2003/05] | French: | Dispositif convoyeur pour articles | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS57121441 ; | [A]US2029805 (FRIEDRICH APPELBERG) [A] 1,3,5* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4397174 (JUNGESJO HARALD N) [A] 1,2,4,7 * abstract *; | [A]US5345831 (SANDROCK DON G [US]) [A] 1 * figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821029), vol. 006, no. 216, Database accession no. (M - 168), & JP57121441 A 19820728 (TOUSHIBA SEIKI KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract * |