EP1273674 - Heat treatment of titanium-alloy article having martensitic structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozbaysal, Kazim 5274 Brasher Avenue Blue Ash, Ohio 45242 / US | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2003/02] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254627.9 | 02.07.2002 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | US20010900411 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: US 900411 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1273674 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1273674 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/18 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C22F1/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, TR [2003/39] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmebehandlung von Artikeln aus Titanlegierung mit martensitischer Struktur | [2003/02] | English: | Heat treatment of titanium-alloy article having martensitic structure | [2003/02] | French: | Traitement thermique d'article en alliage de titane ayant une structure martensitique | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 12.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 09.03.2007 | Appeal received No. T0981/07 | 22.05.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.01.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61106758 ; | [A]JPS63223155 ; | [A]US3901743 (SPRAGUE ROBERT A, et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph 1, lines 63-68; paragraph 3, lines 62-68; paragraph 4, lines 6-8, 19-29; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4053330 (HENRICKS ROBERT JACOBI, et al) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph 2, lines 6-8, 15-35, 40-45; claim 1; paragraph 3,lines 12-14, example, Table I *; | [Y]EP0921207 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs 0005, 0007, 0010,0020; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1078997 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs 0001, 0002, 0007, 0008, 0018; claims 1,3,4,7 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861003), vol. 010, no. 292, Database accession no. (C - 376), & JP61106758 A 19860524 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890118), vol. 013, no. 021, Database accession no. (C - 560), & JP63223155 A 19880916 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * Derwent abstract * * Table 2, example 1;Table 4, example 11 * | [A] - RODNEY BOYER ET AL., Materials Properties Handbook: Titanium Alloys, USA, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (1994), ISBN 0-87170-481-1, XP002216205 [A] 1 * pages 695, 699, 700 * |