EP1281897 - Elastomeric valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Ronald R. 32865 Peoria Road Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/06] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254874.7 | 11.07.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | US20010919169 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: US 919169 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281897 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1281897 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/02, F16K15/14 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
F16K15/145 (EP,US);
B41J2/17596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/43] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elastomeres Ventil | [2003/06] | English: | Elastomeric valve | [2003/06] | French: | Soupape flexible | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5295658 (ATKINSON GORDON E [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7* column 6, line 13 - column 9, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5971024 (PENNY WILLIAM H [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 35; figures 2-6 *; | [X]EP1000753 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * column 11, line 37 - column 21, line 56; figures 6A,6B,9A,10,23A,23B *; | [A]EP1092546 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 9, line 29 - column 10, line 46; figures 4,5 * |