10.07.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
24.03.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.01.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
07.10.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
17.11.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
16.11.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.11.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
09.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.08.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
07.01.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.01.2011 |
First examination report |
|
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
19.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
22.12.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
22.12.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
03.11.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.08.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
20.08.2004 |
Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.08.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |