EP1302902 - Feedback-controlled setting of interpolation parameters used in image rendering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2006/41] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wada, Shinya Sony Computer Entertainment Inc 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255033.9 | 17.07.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | JP20010313919 | 11.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001313919 | JP20020133584 | 09.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002133584 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302902 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1302902 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302902 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/50, G06T11/00, G06T15/20 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G06T11/40 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/16] | G06T15/00, G06T9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Durch Rückkopplung kontrollierte Einstellung der Interpolationsparameter, die zur Bildherstellung benutzt werden | [2003/16] | English: | Feedback-controlled setting of interpolation parameters used in image rendering | [2003/16] | French: | Etablissement contrôlé par feedback de paramètres d'interpolation utilisés pour rendre une image | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | DE | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | IT | 11.10.2006 | |
DE | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | IT | 11.10.2006 | |
DE | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | IT | 11.10.2006 | |
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 22.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5109481 (LATHROP OLIN G [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, lines 12-45,66 - column 3, line 18 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 16 * * column 7, lines 5-46 *; | [A]US5179647 (CHANG SHEUE-LING L [US]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [XA]US5739818 (SPACKMAN JOHN NEIL [GB]) [X] 1,6,11,16 * abstract * * column 1, lines 44-60 * * column 2, lines 8-18,24-41 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 37 * * column 6, line 42 - column 8, line 67 * [A] 2-5,7-10,12-15; | [A]US5835097 (VASWANI GAUTAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, lines 11-67 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 67 * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 33 * |