EP1385022 - Seismic seabed cable with acoustically uncoupled sensor units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ION Geophysical Corporation 2105 City West Boulevard, Suite 400 Houston, TX 77042-2839 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states ION Geophysical Corporation 2105 CityWest Boulevard, Suite 400 Houston, TX 77042-2839 / US | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Input/Output, Inc. 2101 CityWest Boulevard Building 3, Suite 400 Houston, TX 77042 / US | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Input/Output, Inc. 12300 Parc Crest Drive Stafford, Texas 77477 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fagerås, Bjarte Fanavollen 11a 5244 Fana / NO | 02 /
Oldervoll, Magne Grudridhaugen 9 5200 Os / NO | [2017/10] |
Former [2004/05] | 01 /
Fageras, Bjarte Fanavollen 11a 5244 Fana / NO | ||
02 /
Oldervoll Magne Grudridhaugen 9 5200 Os / NO | Representative(s) | Chiva, Andrew Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Chiva, Andrew Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Chiva, Andrew Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/05] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255095.8 | 22.07.2002 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385022 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385022 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/20, G01V1/38 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G01V1/201 (EP,US);
G01V1/3808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/10] |
Former [2004/43] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Seismisches Ozeanbodenkabel mit akustisch entkoppelten Sensoreinheiten | [2004/05] | English: | Seismic seabed cable with acoustically uncoupled sensor units | [2004/05] | French: | Flûte sismique pour fond océanique avec des capteurs acoustiquement découplés | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3350678 (MCLOAD KENNETH W) [X] 1-4,27 * figures 1-3 *; | [DXA]GB1385971 (WESTERN GEOPHYSICAL CO) [DX] 1-3,9-12,14-26,31-34 * page 6, line 28 - line 62; figures 7-11,14 * * page 6, line 75 - line 83 * [A] 4-8,27-30; | [Y]US4628851 (APPLING JAMES [US]) [Y] 4-8,20,27-30 * column 2, line 10 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [X]US5747754 (SVENNING BJORNAR [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,4,17-19 * abstract *; | [DXAY]WO0029874 (ROKKAN ARNE [NO]) [DX] 1-3,9-19,21-26,31,34,35 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 15 * * page 5, line 4 - line 6 * [A] 32,33 [Y] 4-8,20,27-30; | [A]US2001035311 (HE GUOXIN [CN], et al) [A] 4-8,27-30* abstract * |