EP1291142 - Method and backer inserts for blocking backwall water jet strikes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Devine, Robert Henry II 1605 Brentwood Way Simpsonville, South Carolina 29680 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255638.5 | 13.08.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | US20010682372 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: US 682372 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291142 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291142 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B26F3/00, B26F1/26, B24C1/04, B24C3/32, F01D5/18 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
B26F3/008 (EP,US);
B26F1/26 (EP,KR,US);
B23P2700/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | B26F3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/16] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, sowie Sperrplatten, zum Sperren von Wasserstrahlprallen auf eine Rückwand | [2003/11] | English: | Method and backer inserts for blocking backwall water jet strikes | [2003/11] | French: | Procédé ainsi que plaquettes de blocage pour arrêter des impactes de jets d'eau sur une paroi postérieure | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4081892 (MERCER JOHN E) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 7; figure -; claims 1,8 *; | [A]EP0454223 (AE TURBINE COMPONENTS [GB]) [A] 1-10 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]US5222617 (GREGORY OWEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]FR2699850 (SNECMA [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19711512 (FORACON MASCHINEN UND ANLAGENB [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 37 - line 58; figure -; claims 1,9 *; | [A]EP1043480 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0040] , [0047]; figure - * |