EP1284156 - Foaming apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grundmann, Steven R. 2209 Fairway Duncan, OK 73533 / US | 02 /
Neal, Kenneth G. 216 North 30th Duncan, OK 73533 / US | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255705.2 | 15.08.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | US20010932603 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: US 932603 | [2003/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284156 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284156 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284156 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04, B01F3/04, B28C5/38 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
B28C5/02 (EP,US);
B01F25/4422 (EP,US);
B01F23/235 (EP,US);
B01F25/3111 (EP,US);
B01F25/4413 (EP,US);
B28C5/381 (EP,US);
Y10S261/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/42] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Aufschäumen | [2003/08] | English: | Foaming apparatus and method | [2003/08] | French: | Appareil et procédé de moussage | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5366288 (DAHLLOEF HAKAN [SE], et al) [X] 1-10* column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 19; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US5556200 (EKHOLM ROLF [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 51; figures 1,5,6,8 * |