EP1289099 - Starter/generator to turbine insulated coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Center, 2730 East Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Center, 2730 East Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Lucas Aerospace Power Equipment Corporation 777, Lena Drive Aurora, Ohio 44202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mackulin, Bryan J. 2348 North Medina Line Road Akron, Ohio 44333 / US | 02 /
Travers, Todd A. 905 Hampton Drive Macedonia, Ohio 44056 / US | 03 /
Karabinus, John R. 130 Parmelee Drive Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Hopley, Joanne Selina Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Hopley, Joanne Selina Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street, Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255890.2 | 23.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | GB20010020748 | 25.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0120748 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289099 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1289099 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/00, H02K7/18 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H02K7/003 (EP,US);
H02K7/1823 (EP,US);
H02K5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/30] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Isolierte Kupplung zwischen Starter-Generator und Gasturbine | [2003/10] | English: | Starter/generator to turbine insulated coupling | [2003/10] | French: | Accouplement isolé entre alternateur-démarreur et turbine | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 11.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/28] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1182905 (HAMILTON WILLIAM P B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1802342 (FROUSSARD ALBERT F) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2385369 (NIEKAMP RICHARD A) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB680274 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [A] 10,11,15* the whole document *; | [A]US2790311 (IRVING KALIKOW) [A] 10,11,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4407602 (TERRY JR VINCENT G [US]) [A] 8,9; | [A]US5795232 (SITZBERGER CARL R [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 * |