Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
04.04.2006 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.04.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.09.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.08.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2003 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
28.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights | |
24.01.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] |