EP1291680 - Multilayer-film mirrors for use in extreme UV optical systems, and methods for manufacturing such mirrors exhibiting improved wave aberrations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 6-3 Nishi-Ohi 1-Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 6-3 Nishi-Ohi, 1-Chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kandaka, Noriaki c/o Nikon Corporation, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Katsuhiko c/o Nikon Corporation, 2-3, Marunouchi-3chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 03 /
Komatsuda, Hideki c/o Nikon Corporation, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
Ishiyama, Wakana c/o Nikon Corporation, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 05 /
Shiraishi, Masayuki c/o Nikon Corporation, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 06 /
Sugisaki, Katsumi c/o Nikon Corporation, 2-3, Marinouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 07 /
Yamamoto, Masaki c/o Nikon Corporation, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02255926.4 | 27.08.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | JP20010255983 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001255983 | JP20010266148 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001266148 | JP20010268322 | 05.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001268322 | JP20010277808 | 13.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001277808 | JP20010277810 | 13.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001277810 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291680 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, B29D11/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G02B27/46 (EP,US);
G02B5/0891 (EP,US);
G03F7/70258 (EP,US);
G03F7/70316 (EP,US);
G03F7/706 (EP,US);
G21K1/062 (EP,US);
H01J37/304 (EP,US);
H01J37/3056 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multischicht-Spiegel für das ferne UV, und Hertellungsverfahren für solche Spiegel mit verringerten Aberration | [2003/11] | English: | Multilayer-film mirrors for use in extreme UV optical systems, and methods for manufacturing such mirrors exhibiting improved wave aberrations | [2003/11] | French: | Miroir multicouche pour les UV extrêmes, et méthode de fabricatiion de tels miroirs avec abérrations réduites | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.03.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |