EP1291801 - Incentive based vertical market [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eSpeed, Inc. 135 East 57th Street New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states eSPEED, Inc. 135 East 57th Street New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutnick, Howard W. 200 E 69th Street, Penthouse B New York, New York 10021 / US | 02 /
Noviello, Joseph 107 West 86th Street, Apt. 17A New York, New York 10024 / US | 03 /
Uman, Jonathan Deceased / US | 04 /
Varacchi, Frederick Deceased / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Jones, David Colin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Jones, David Colin, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255943.9 | 27.08.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | US20010315259P | 27.08.2001 Original published format: US 315259 P | US20010963197 | 25.09.2001 Original published format: US 963197 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291801 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291801 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0208 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0213 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/16] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anreiz-basierter, senkrechter Markt | [2003/11] | English: | Incentive based vertical market | [2003/11] | French: | Marché vertical basé sur l'incitation | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2005/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |