EP1291772 - Failure prediction apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comverse, Ltd. 23 Habarzel Street Tel Aviv 69710 / IL | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levy, Dorron 12 KKL St. Givataim 53237 / IL | 02 /
Tibika, Pierre Gérard 15 Haknesset Hagdola Tel Aviv 62907 / IL | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Shackleton, Nicola, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Shackleton, Nicola, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256133.6 | 04.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | US20010317181P | 06.09.2001 Original published format: US 317181 P | US20010996789 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: US 996789 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291772 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291772 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F11/28 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G06F11/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Fehlervoraussage | [2003/11] | English: | Failure prediction apparatus and method | [2003/11] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de prédiction de panne | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5654896 (OCHI SAM SEIICHIRO [US]) [A] 1-40 * column 3, lines 17-23; figure 3 ** column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 45 *; | [X]US5991707 (SEARLES WARREN W [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * column 3, lines 20-26 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 11 * * column 31, line 18 - column 32, line 24 *; | [A]US6249887 (GRAY WILLIAM F [US], et al) [A] 2,17,21,36 * column 9, line 18 - column 11, line 60 * * figure 7 * |