EP1291762 - System and method for addition followed by predictive comparison [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hossain, Razak 9222 Adolphia Street San Diego, California 92129 / US | 02 /
Huang, Lun-Bin 5620 Willowmere Lane San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256200.3 | 06.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | US20010948360 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: US 948360 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291762 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291762 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/02 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
G06F7/505 (EP,US);
G06F7/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | G06F7/02, G06F7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/23] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für eine einer Addition nachgeordneten prädiktiven Vergleichung | [2003/11] | English: | System and method for addition followed by predictive comparison | [2003/11] | French: | Système et méthode pour une addition suivie d'une comparaison | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/06] | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10019698 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - CORTADELLA J ET AL, "Evaluating 'A+B=K' conditions in constant time", ISCAS'88, 1998 IEEE, (19880607), pages 243 - 246, XP010069536 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LUTZ D R ET AL, "Early zero detection Yintegrated adder/subtracter/zero-detector", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER DESIGN. ICCD. VLSI IN COMPUTERS AND PROCESSORS. AUSTIN, OCT. 7 - 9, 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19961007), ISBN 0-8186-7554-3, pages 545 - 550, XP010201849 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCD.1996.563605 |