EP1292101 - Communication apparatus, method of controlling same, and control program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakao, Muneki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256254.0 | 10.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | JP20010275370 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001275370 | JP20010275367 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001275367 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1292101 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1292101 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H04N1/00416 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
H04N1/00384 (EP,US);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/23] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsgerät, Verfahren zur Steuerung desselben, und Steuerprogramm | [2003/11] | English: | Communication apparatus, method of controlling same, and control program | [2003/11] | French: | Dispositif de communication, procédé de commande du même, et logiciel de commande | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0837597 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [X]EP1100013 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0179] *; | [A] - ABRAMS M ET AL, "UIML: an appliance-independent XML user interface language", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990517), vol. 31, no. 11-16, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 1695 - 1708, XP004304584 [A] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(99)00044-4 |