EP1293794 - MRI acquisition method using the SENSE technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Kevin Franklin 15651 West Ridge Road New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US | 02 /
Angelos, Elisabeth Carol 923 Parkview Street Hartland, Wisconsin 53029 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Pedder, James Cuthbert GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256324.1 | 12.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | US20010952446 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: US 952446 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293794 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293794 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/3415, G01R33/561 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G01R33/5611 (EP,US);
G01R33/3415 (EP,US);
G01R33/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | G01R33/3415 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2005/24] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetresonanzbildgebung mit dem SENSE-Verfahren | [2003/12] | English: | MRI acquisition method using the SENSE technique | [2003/12] | French: | Imagerie par résonance magnétique avec la technique SENSE | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.08.2008 | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/01] | 22.08.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 26.08.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.08.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9954746 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 13 - line 24 * * page 8, line 32 - page 10, line 22 *; | [X] - WEIGER M. ET AL, "2D SENSE for Faster 3D Imaging", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, EIGHTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, DENVER, COLORADO, USEA, (20000401), vol. 1, page 152, XP002288709 [X] 1-5 * figure 1 * | [T] - KING K F ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "SENSE from a commercial perspective", SECOND JOINT EMBS-BMES CONFERENCE 2002. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. 24TH. ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY. ANNUAL FALL MEETING OF THE BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERINGSOCIETY. HOUSTON, TX, OCT. 23 - 26, 2002, ANNUA, (20021023), VOL. 1 OF 3. CONF. 24, ISBN 0-7803-7612-9, pages 1175 - 1176, XP010620014 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2002.1106333 |