|
08.04.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.01.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
24.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |