10.04.2015 |
Refusal of application |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
27.01.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
22.01.2015 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
07.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2014 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
24.09.2014 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.05.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
24.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
28.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2009 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.09.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
15.09.2009 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
01.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
01.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
23.09.2008 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.01.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.01.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
30.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
29.10.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
08.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
06.02.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |