Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4454923B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2010 | B2 | JP2004147476 | 20.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US94089801 | 29.08.2001 | EP02256491 | 19.09.2002 | TW90121374 | 29.08.2001 | CN01136244 | 11.10.2001 | JP2002312737 | 28.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1401090 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94089801 | 29.08.2001 | EP02256491 | 19.09.2002 | TW90121374 | 29.08.2001 | CN01136244 | 11.10.2001 | JP2002312737 | 28.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1412946 | 23.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US94089801 | 29.08.2001 | EP02256491 | 19.09.2002 | TW90121374 | 29.08.2001 | CN01136244 | 11.10.2001 | JP2002312737 | 28.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW564590B | 01.12.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US94089801 | 29.08.2001 | EP02256491 | 19.09.2002 | TW90121374 | 29.08.2001 | CN01136244 | 11.10.2001 | JP2002312737 | 28.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6930408 | 16.08.2005 | B2 | US2003042797 | 06.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94089801 | 29.08.2001 | EP02256491 | 19.09.2002 | TW90121374 | 29.08.2001 | CN01136244 | 11.10.2001 | JP2002312737 | 28.10.2002 | Type | Divisional application | Application withdrawn : 04.02.2011 |