EP1401090 - Polarity inversion circuit for pulsating DC power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her No. 59 Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Tai-Her, Yang No 29 Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2009/43] | Thompson, Andrew John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2004/13] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256491.8 | 19.09.2002 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1401090 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/10, H02J7/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
H02M1/14 (EP,US);
H02J7/00711 (EP,US);
H02M5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/13] | Title | German: | Polaritätsumkehrschaltung für eine Impuls-Gleichstromversorgung | [2004/13] | English: | Polarity inversion circuit for pulsating DC power supply | [2004/13] | French: | Circuit d'inversion de polarité pour alimentation en courant continu impulsionelle | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/20] | 06.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.01.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/20] | Appeal following examination | 03.07.2009 | Appeal received No. T2000/09 | 14.09.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 20.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10183594.0 Application withdrawn : 04.02.2011 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4691158 (HASHIMOTO TAKAFUMI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1026769 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 2-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6278260 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]) [A] 2-6 * abstract *; | [X] - KAZIMIERCZUK M K ET AL, "CLASS D VOLTAGE-SWITCHING INVERTER WITH TAPPED RESONANT INDUCTOR", IEE PROCEEDINGS B. ELECTRICAL POWER APPLICATIONS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, (19930501), vol. 140, no. 3 PART B, pages 177 - 185, XP000304271 [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * | [X] - FUJII M ET AL, "Resonant DC/DC converter with class D inverter and class E synchronous rectifier using thinned-out method", TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE, 1995. INTELEC '95., 17TH INTERNATIONAL THE HAGUE, NETHERLANDS 29 OCT.-1 NOV. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19951029), ISBN 0-7803-2750-0, pages 496 - 501, XP010161282 [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INTLEC.1995.499002 |