EP1300959 - Mobile phone strap holder apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehtonen, Jarmo Verkaranta 3 C 72 20660 Littoinen / FI | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256619.4 | 24.09.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | US20010970777 | 05.10.2001 Original published format: US 970777 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300959 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, A45F5/00 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
A45F5/02 (EP,US);
A45F5/021 (EP,US);
H04B1/3888 (EP,US);
A45F2003/002 (EP,US);
A45F2003/006 (EP,US);
A45F2005/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragbares Telefon mit Gurtsystem und dazugehöriges Verfahren | [2003/15] | English: | Mobile phone strap holder apparatus and method | [2003/15] | French: | Téléphone portable avec système de sangle et procédé correspondant | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2266452 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 16 - page 7, line 3 *; | [A]WO9956448 (MICHALERIS MICHALIS [GR]) [A] 1 * page 9, lines 16-31 *; | [A]DE19833517 (FABRA VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT MB [DE]) [A] 1,5,7,8* column 4, lines 14-44 *; | [A]US6094566 (DASENT MARLON GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 4, line 45 * |