EP1403167 - Steering wheel cover having a decorative lighting unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huang, Yuan-Yuan No. 33, Lane 75, Section 2, Chung-Cheng N. Road Kuei-Jen Hsiang Tainan Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Huang, Yuan-Yuan No. 33, Lane 75, Section 2, Chung-Cheng N. Road Kuei-Jen Hsiang, Tainan Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256759.8 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403167 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/06 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
B60R13/02 (EP,US);
B60Q3/283 (EP);
B62D1/06 (EP);
B60K2360/33 (EP,US);
B60R11/00 (EP);
B60R2011/001 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/52] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lenkradverkleidung mit dekorativer Beleuchtung | [2004/14] | English: | Steering wheel cover having a decorative lighting unit | [2004/14] | French: | Couvercle de volant avec appareil d'éclairage décoratif | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2002205658 ; | [A]JP2001114112 ; | [A]US5085098 (BUCKLEY LARRY J [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 34 - line 37 * * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2744976 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 11-13 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 4 ** figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO9920936 (MAGNA REFLEX HOLDING GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE20018732U (PETRI AG [DE]) [A] 9,11 * page 6 - page 7 * * figure 1A *; | [A]EP1069023 (GERSTEEN ISO DELTA [FR]) [A] 1,7-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 3-5 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE20014731U (R D I DEUTSCHLAND AUTOTEILE & [DE]) [Y] 2-6 * page 10, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6371572 (FRANK DONALD E [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 25 * * figures 4,7-9 *; | [A]US2002104746 (VALK MARY ANN T [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * figure 2 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021106), vol. 2002, no. 11, & JP2002205658 A 20020723 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0027] * * figures 5,6 * [Y] 2-6,11-13 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001114112 A 20010424 (T S TEC KK) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract * |