EP1300365 - Complex oxides, oxide-ion conductors, oxide-ion conducting films and electrochemical cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Yoshihiko, c/o Intellectual Property Dpt NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Kaigawa, Kazuyuki, c/o Intellectual Property Dept. NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
Kawasaki, Shinji, c/o Intellectual Property Dept. NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Hiroaki, c/o Intellectual Property Dept. NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8530 / JP | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256790.3 | 30.09.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | JP20010299268 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299268 | JP20010379657 | 13.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001379657 | JP20020220626 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002220626 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300365 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300365 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300365 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01F17/00, C01G49/00, C01G51/00, H01B1/08, H01M8/10 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
C04B35/44 (EP,US);
C01F17/34 (EP,US);
C01G49/0054 (EP,US);
C01G51/68 (EP,US);
H01B1/08 (EP,US);
H01M8/1246 (EP,US);
C01P2002/34 (EP,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2002/54 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3279 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/768 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/15] | Title | German: | Komplexe Oxide, Oxidionenleiter, leitende Oxidionenschichten und elektrochemische Zellen | [2003/15] | English: | Complex oxides, oxide-ion conductors, oxide-ion conducting films and electrochemical cells | [2003/15] | French: | Oxydes complexes, conducteurs d'ions oxydes, films conducteurs d'ions oxydes et cellules électrochimiques | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CH | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | CZ | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | EE | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | FR | 24.01.2007 | IT | 24.01.2007 | LI | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | SK | 24.01.2007 | TR | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | BG | 25.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | ES | 05.05.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | LU | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | IE | 01.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
LU | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
FR | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
FR | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH11335164 ; | [T]US6586127 (ISHIHARA TATSUMI [JP], et al) [T] * claims 1-3,7,10,19,20,22,23,25,26 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 67 ** example 5 *; | [XY] - MATSUDA, HIDEAKI ET AL, Oxygen ion conductivity of doped rare-earth aluminum oxide ( LnAlO3 ) perovskite oxides, PROCEEDINGS - ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY (1993), 93-4 (PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELLS, 1993), 129-36, XP001155596 [X] 1 * pages 129-131 (first paragraph);; figure 1 * [Y] 2-10 | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11335164 A 19991207 (TAKITA YUSAKU;ISHIHARA TATSUKI; MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [DY] 2-10 * abstract * | [DA] - RANLOEV, JENS, Perovskite -type metal oxides. Electrical conductivity and structure, RISOE NATIONAL LABORATORY, [REPORT] RISOE-R (1995), RISOE-R-796, 131 PP. (P. 84-107), XP009019616 [DA] 1 * page 91 * |