Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
20.04.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
18.08.2006 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
08.08.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
08.08.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
15.03.2006 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
21.12.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.11.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.08.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.07.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
15.06.2005 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
15.06.2005 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
27.05.2005 | First examination report | |
26.05.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.02.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
28.01.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
10.11.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.05.2004 | Publication of search report | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
28.05.2004 | Change - classification | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
15.04.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |