EP1315149 - Method and apparatus to eliminate discontinuities in adaptively filtered signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Juin-Hwey No. 10 Blessing Irvine, California 92612 / US | 02 /
Thyssen, Jes 7 Novilla Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | 03 /
Lee, Chris C. 11 Laurelwood Irvine, California 92620-1297 / US | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02256894.3 | 03.10.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | US20010326449P | 03.10.2001 Original published format: US 326449 P | US20020183554 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 183554 | US20020183418 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 183418 | US20020215048 | 09.08.2002 Original published format: US 215048 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315149 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1315149 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315149 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14, G06F17/15, H03H17/02 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G10L19/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | G10L19/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/14] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Beseitigung von Diskontinuitäten eines adaptiv gefilterten Signals | [2003/22] | English: | Method and apparatus to eliminate discontinuities in adaptively filtered signals | [2003/22] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour l'élimination des discontinuités dans les signaux adaptivement filtrés | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0732687 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-31 * page 6, line 32 - line 52 ** figures 7,8 *; | [X]US5999899 (ROBINSON ANTHONY JOHN [GB]) [X] 1-31 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 29 * * column 8, line 52 - line 67 * * column 11, line 18 - line 31 * * column 11, line 59 - column 12, line 5 * |