EP1302704 - Submerged electric fluid pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills MI 48326-2872 / US | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. Powertrain Technical Center, 3800 Automation Avenue Auburn Hills, Michigan / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pringle, Hal 3660 Forest Hill Road Bloomfield, Michigan 48302 / US | 02 /
Keefover, Robert D. 21900 Leyte Farmington Hills, Michigan 48336 / US | 03 /
Halsig, Michael J. 30510 Warner Warren, Michigan 48092 / US | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257064.2 | 11.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | US20010977774 | 15.10.2001 Original published format: US 977774 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302704 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1302704 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302704 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
F04C2/102 (EP,US);
F04C11/008 (EP,US);
F04C13/008 (EP,US);
F04C15/008 (EP,US);
F04C15/0096 (EP,US);
F16H57/0434 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/20] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eingetauchte, elektrische Fluidpumpe | [2003/16] | English: | Submerged electric fluid pump | [2003/16] | French: | Pompe électrique de fluide immergée | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]USRE29445E (NUSSER HERMANN) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0509724 (VICKERS INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-3,6 *; | [X]EP0754865 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,3a,3b *; | [X]DE19627668 (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6034465 (MCKEE GARY F [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** column 12, line 25 - line 35 * |