EP1308487 - Methods of controlling bleed between black and color dye based inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rehman, Zia 3010 NE Glacier Way Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/19] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257170.7 | 16.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | US20010001645 | 30.10.2001 Original published format: US 1645 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1308487 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308487 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/05] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ausblutkontrolle zwischen schwarzen und farbigen Tinten | [2003/19] | English: | Methods of controlling bleed between black and color dye based inks | [2003/19] | French: | Procédés de contrôle de bavure entre des encres noires et des encres colorées pendant l'impression | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 20.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0649888 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,10-13,19,20* page 3, lines 9-21 *; | [YA]EP0872344 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,10 * page 6, line 10 * * page 6, lines 24-33 * * page 9, lines 5-30 * [A] 2,3,10-12,19,20; | [YA]EP1029903 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1,10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] * * column 6, lines 26-44 * [A] 2-5,10-13,19,20 |