EP1304486 - Stator blading for centrifugal compressors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Holding S.P.A. Via F. Matteucci 2 50127 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Holding S.P.A. 2, Via Felice Matteucci 50127 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossi, Eugenio Via IV Novembre, 4 55049 Viareggio, Lucca / IT | 02 /
Pelagotti, Antonio Via I Maggio, 324/a 50019 Sesto Fiorentino, Florence / IT | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257224.2 | 17.10.2002 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI02169 | 18.10.2001 Original published format: IT MI20012169 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304486 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1304486 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/44 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
F04D29/444 (EP,US);
F04D17/122 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2010/07] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leitschaufel für Kreiselverdichter | [2003/17] | English: | Stator blading for centrifugal compressors | [2003/17] | French: | Aube statorique pour compresseur centrifugal | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 11.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SK, TR | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/16] | 11.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08159094 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1-7* the whole document * |