EP1304612 - Printing method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gomes, John Isaac Chandan Blk 7, Neptune Court, No. 23-11, 10 Marine Vista Singapore 449031 / SG | 02 /
Tan, Chuan 341, Upper Bukit Timah Road D07-09 Singapore 588195 / SG | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/17] | 01 /
Gomes, John Isaac Chandan Blk 7, Neptune Court, No. 23-11, 10 Marine Vista Singapore 449031 / SG | ||
02 /
Tan, Chuan 341, Upper Bukit Timah Road #07-09 Singapore 588195 / SG | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams, Powell, 4 St, Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257239.0 | 18.10.2002 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | SG20010006486 | 19.10.2001 Original published format: SG 200106486 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304612 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1304612 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/1292 (EP,US);
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1206 (EP,US);
G06F3/1236 (EP,US);
G06F3/1247 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/26] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckverfahren und System | [2003/17] | English: | Printing method and system | [2003/17] | French: | Méthode d'impression et système | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0893760 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * figures 1,3,4,7 * * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 18 ** column 10, line 14 - column 13, line 17 * |