EP1308572 - Method and apparatus for lighting with a one-piece panel having a plurality of holes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kotovsky, Irwin 3941 California Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257283.8 | 21.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | US20010005255 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: US 5255 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308572 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308572 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308572 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/02, F21S2/00, E04B9/32, B28B1/00 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
E04B9/32 (EP,US);
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
F21V21/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | E04B9/32, F21S2/00, B28B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsverfahren und -vorrichtung mit einem einstückigen, gelochten Paneel | [2010/28] | English: | Method and apparatus for lighting with a one-piece panel having a plurality of holes | [2003/19] | French: | Procedé et dispositif d'éclairage avec un panneau monobloc percé | [2003/19] |
Former [2003/19] | Beleuchtungsverfahren und -vorrichtung mit einem eisstückigen, gelochten Paneel | Examination procedure | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2010 | 17.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.2011 | CY | 16.02.2011 | CZ | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | NL | 16.02.2011 | SE | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | TR | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | ES | 27.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | IE | 21.10.2011 | LU | 21.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 21.10.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 21.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 16.02.2011 | |
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5009383 (CHAPMAN JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-4,12-14 * column 3, line 36 - line 55 * * column 4, line 2 - line 8 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 5-9,19; | [XAY]DE9401162U (KORTE HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1,2,12,15,16 * page 6, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 3,4,13,14,19 [Y] 3-9,17; | [A]EP0945675 (KOTOVSKY IRWIN [US]) [A] 1-5,7-9,12-14,18,19 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 29 - line 33 * * column 3, line 51 - line 54 ** figures 1,6,8 *; | [XA]EP1020682 (WOFI LEUCHTEN WORTMANN & FILZ [DE]) [X] 1,12,15 * column 4, line 30 - line 38 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 4 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 18,19; | [A]US6170965 (KOTOVSKY IRWIN [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 20 - line 33 * * figures 1-3,10 *; | [YA]EP1092916 (KOTOVSKY IRWIN [US]) [Y] 3-9,17 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 8 * * figures 1-3,5-7,9-14,17-19 * [A] 1-4,12-16 | by applicant | US6170965 |