EP1308780 - Method and apparatus for generating masks utilized in conjunction with dipole illumination techniques [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML MaskTools B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML MaskTools B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states ASML Masktools B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capodieci, Luigi 315 Van Ness Avenue Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 02 /
Torres Robles, Juan Andres 29499 SW Maedows Loop, No. 269 Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US | 03 /
Van Os, Lodewijk Hubertus Stevertsemolen 20 5612 DT Eindhoven / NL | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257624.3 | 04.11.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | US20010985621 | 05.11.2001 Original published format: US 985621 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308780 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308780 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308780 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G03F1/70 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
G03F1/36 (EP,US);
G03F7/70125 (EP,US);
G03F7/70425 (EP,US);
G03F7/70466 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | G03F1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/41] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Masken zur Benutzung mit Dipolbelichtung | [2003/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for generating masks utilized in conjunction with dipole illumination techniques | [2003/19] | French: | Méthode et appareil de fabrication de masques utilisés conjointement à des techniques d'illumination dipolaire | [2005/21] |
Former [2003/19] | Méthode et apparail de fabrication de masques utilisés conjointement à des techniques d'illumination dipolaire | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 11.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000311853 ; | [A]US5472814 (LIN BURN J [US]) [A] 1,9-11,15 * abstract * * column 4, line 9 - line 18 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 62 *; | [A]WO0025181 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,9-11,15 * abstract *; | [A]WO0067075 (MENTOR GRAPHICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-6,14 * abstract * * claims 1-9,17 *; | US6518180 [ ] (FUKUDA HIROSHI [JP]) [ ] * abstract ** column 2, line 19 - column 6, line 51 *; | [XP] - HSU S D ET AL, "Dipole decomposition mask design for full-chip implementation at 100 nm technology node and beyond", OPTICAL MICROLITHOGRAPHY XV, SANTA CLARA, CA, USA, 5-8 MARCH 2002, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 2002, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 4691, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 476 - 490, XP002261072 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.474596 | [XP] - TORRES J A ET AL, "Model-assisted double dipole decomposition", OPTICAL MICROLITHOGRAPHY XV, SANTA CLARA, CA, USA, 5-8 MARCH 2002, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 2002, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 4691, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 407 - 417, XP002261073 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.474589 | [XP] - TORRES J A ET AL, "Design verification flow for model assisted double dipole decomposition", DESIGN, PROCESS INTEGRATION, AND CHARACTERIZATION FOR MICROELECTRONICS, SANTA CLARA, CA, USA, 6-7 MARCH 2002, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 2002, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 4692, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 585 - 592, XP002261074 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.475695 | [A] - EURLINGS M ET AL, "0.11- mu m imaging in KrF lithography using dipole illumination", LITHOGRAPHY FOR SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING II, EDINBURGH, UK, 30 MAY-1 JUNE 2001, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 2001, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 4404, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 266 - 278, XP009020880 [A] 1,9-11,13,15,16 * abstract * * page 275 - page 278; figures 13,14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.425215 | [A] - SEO-MIN KIM ET AL, "Optimization of dipole off-axis illumination by 1st-order efficiency method for sub-120 nm node with KrF lithography", DIGEST OF PAPERS MICROPROCESSES AND NANOTECHNOLOGY 2000. 2000 INTERNATIONAL MICROPROCESSES AND NANOTECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, TOKYO, JAPAN, 11-13 JULY 2000, Japanese Journal of Applied Physics, Part 1 (Regular Papers, Short Notes & Review Papers), Dec. 2000, Japan Soc. Appl. Phys, Japan, vol. 39, no. 12B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 6777 - 6780, XP002261075 [A] 1,9-11,16 * abstract * * page 6777, column 1 * * page 6779 - page 6780 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.39.6777 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000311853 A 20001107 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1,9-11,16 * abstract * |