EP1315001 - Radar system and method for merging detected targets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU TEN LIMITED 1-2-28 Gosho-dori, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo / JP | [2014/34] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states FUJITSU TEN LIMITED 1-2-28 Gosho-dori, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokutsu, Masahiro c/o Fujitsu Ten Ltd. 1-2-28, Gosho-dori Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Kishida, Masayuki c/o Fujitsu Ten Ltd. 1-2-28, Gosho-dori Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Shinagawa, Tokio c/o Fujitsu Ten Ltd. 1-2-28, Gosho-dori Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2014/34] |
Former [2003/22] | 01 /
Tokutsu, Masahiro c/o Fujitsu Ten Ltd., 1-2-28, Gosho-dori, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | ||
02 /
Kishida, Masayuki c/o Fujitsu Ten Ltd., 1-2-28, Gosho-dori, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | |||
03 /
Shinagawa, Tokio c/o Fujitsu Ten Ltd., 1-2-28, Gosho-dori, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2014/34] |
Former [2003/22] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257670.6 | 06.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | JP20010347693 | 13.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001347693 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315001 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1315001 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315001 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, // G01S13/34, G01S13/42, G01S13/72 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S13/426 (EP,US);
G01S13/726 (EP,US);
G01S2013/932 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9325 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | G01S13/93 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/01] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Radarsystem und -verfahren zum Verschmelzen von detektierten Zielen | [2003/22] | English: | Radar system and method for merging detected targets | [2003/22] | French: | Système et procédé radar pour fusionner de cibles détectées | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2005 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 20.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/48] | GB | 20.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5587929 (LEAGUE RICHARD B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 2,3,5,7,8 * * column 2, lines 14-22,32,33 * * column 3, lines 29,30 * * column 4, lines 48-56,59-61 * * column 6, lines 5-17,29-31 * * column 5, line 64 - column 7, line 4 * * column 8, lines 9,10,29-36,50,51,58-65 * * column 9, lines 13-16 * * column 10, lines 10-14,20-26 * * column 11, lines 49-55 * * column 12, lines 1-15,28-39 * * column 13, lines 2,3,30-40 * [Y] 3; | [Y] - E. TAENZER, "Tracking multiple targets simulataneously with a phased array radar", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, (19800901), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 604 - 614, XP002266935 [Y] 3 * page 610 - page 611 * * figures 2,6-8 * | [A] - S. BLACKMAN, R. POPOLI, Design and analysis of modern tracking systems, NORWOOD, MA, ARTECH HOUSE, (1999), XP002266936 [A] 1-4 * page 374 - page 377 * |