EP1312880 - Rotary compressor and refrigeration circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-5-5, Keihan-hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [2015/27] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamasaki, Haruhisa H1-503,986-5 Yoshida, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Tadano, Masaya 1546-4, Nakaeda, Nitta-machi Nitta-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Masumoto, Kenzo 2105-3, Kokai, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Sato, Kazuya 2-14-14, Nishikoizumi, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 05 /
Dai, Matsuura Panhaitsu-hokuto 202, 1297-1, Higashiyajima-cho Ota-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 06 /
Takayasu, Saito Otoneryo 3-25-1, Sengoku, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257672.2 | 06.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | JP20010353548 | 19.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001353548 | JP20010359131 | 26.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001359131 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312880 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1312880 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F25B47/02, F25B1/10, F04C23/00, F01C21/08 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
F04C28/08 (EP,US);
F04C23/00 (KR);
F01C21/0809 (EP,US);
F01C21/0845 (EP,US);
F01C21/0863 (EP,US);
F04C18/3562 (EP,US);
F04C23/001 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F25B1/10 (EP,US);
F25B47/022 (EP,US);
F04C2210/1027 (EP,US);
F04C2210/1072 (EP,US);
F04C29/023 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B31/026 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | Drehkolbenverdichter und Kältekreislauf | [2003/21] | English: | Rotary compressor and refrigeration circuit | [2003/21] | French: | Compresseur rotatif et circuit frigorifique | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000104690 ; | [AX]EP0768501 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-3,10-12 * column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 35; figure 4 * * column 7, line 10 - column 7, line 48 * [X] 8,9; | [A]EP0935106 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-3,10-12 * column 6, line 14 - column 6, line 57; figures 1,2 * * column 8, line 10 - column 9, line 31 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000104690 A 20000411 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-3,10-12 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0768501 | EP0935106 | JP2000104690 |