EP1310227 - Electric lifting cushion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newman Engineering Inc. 61 Research Road Toronto, Ontario M4G 2G8 / CA | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newman, Duncan 314 Kenilworth Avenue Toronto, Ontario M4L 2S8 / CA | 02 /
Knappers, Michael A. 148 Holborne Avenue Toronto, Ontario M4L 2R6 / CA | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Picker, Madeline Margaret Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Picker, Madeline Margaret Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257761.3 | 08.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | US20010986737 | 09.11.2001 Original published format: US 986737 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310227 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310227 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1310227 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/14 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
A61G5/14 (EP,US);
Y10S297/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Hebekissen | [2003/20] | English: | Electric lifting cushion | [2003/20] | French: | Coussin de levage électrique | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 13.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | BE | 04.10.2006 | CH | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | CZ | 04.10.2006 | EE | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | IT | 04.10.2006 | LI | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | SK | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | IE | 08.11.2006 | LU | 08.11.2006 | FR | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | BG | 04.01.2007 | DK | 04.01.2007 | GB | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | ES | 15.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
TR | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
LU | 08.11.2006 | ||
FR | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
GB | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
FR | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
GB | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
FR | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
GB | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
GB | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
GB | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 04.10.2006 | |
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3250569 (GAFFNEY EDWARD J) [X] 1,2,15 * column 2, lines 17-33 * * column 3, lines 4-13 * * column 3, lines 20-35 * * figures 1,9 * [A] 3,5,7,9,12,17; | [A]US5294179 (RUDES ARNOLD H [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,13,15,19 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 13 * * column 4, lines 61-66 ** figure 3 * | by applicant | US5316370 |