EP1321334 - Exterior rearview mirror with built-in camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murakami Corporation 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Murakami Corporation 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hitomi, Yoshinori Toyota Jidosha K.K., 1 Toyota-Cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Fujikawa, Yoshihiro Toyota Jidosha K.K., 1 Toyota-Cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Akiyoshi Murakami Corporation Fujieda Works, 748 Hyodayu Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2003/26] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257850.4 | 14.11.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | JP20010369148 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001369148 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1321334 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1321334 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06, B60R1/12, B60R11/04 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
B60R11/04 (EP,US);
B60R1/06 (KR);
B60R1/074 (EP,US);
B60R1/12 (EP,US);
B60R2001/1253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugaussenrückblickspiegel mit eingebauter Kamera | [2003/26] | English: | Exterior rearview mirror with built-in camera | [2003/26] | French: | Rétroviseur extérieur avec caméra incorporée | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60214691 ; | [A]JP2000108786 ; | [A]JP2001130324 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860314), vol. 010, no. 065, Database accession no. (E - 388), & JP60214691 A 19851026 (NAIRUSU BUHIN KK) [A] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000108786 A 20000418 (YANAGAWA KICHIJI) [A] 1,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001130324 A 20010515 (ICHIKOH IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |