EP1317170 - Shielding structure for resonant circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakamori, Masahiro, c/o Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257922.1 | 15.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | JP20010366406 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001366406 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1317170 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1317170 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00, H05K1/02, H03H1/00 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H05K1/0218 (EP,US);
H05K3/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Struktur zur Abschirmung eines Resonanzkreises | [2003/23] | English: | Shielding structure for resonant circuit | [2003/23] | French: | Structure de blindage pour circuit résonnant | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 21.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/40] | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0639940 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 2 - column 7, line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2324425 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 7, paragraph 5 ** page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 2; figure 1 * |