EP1332874 - Paper-web holding apparatus for rotary printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD. 26-24, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD. 26-24, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishibashi, Nobutaka 7-41-18, Gumizawa, Totsuka-ku Yokohama / JP | 02 /
Iwahashi, Yoshihiro 1112-10, Nogawa, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Kazuo 3-936-4-1-401, Shinmarukohigashi, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki / JP | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257985.8 | 20.11.2002 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | JP20020027530 | 05.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002027530 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332874 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/06, B65H26/02 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
B41F33/08 (EP,US);
B41F33/06 (EP,US);
B65H26/00 (EP,US);
B65H2403/725 (EP,US);
B65H2403/7252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/18] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Papierbahn-Haltevorrichtung für Rotationsdruckmaschine | [2003/32] | English: | Paper-web holding apparatus for rotary printing press | [2003/32] | French: | Dispositif de mantien d'une bande de papier pour machine d'impression rotative | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2009 | 24.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/40] | 24.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE558071 (WINKLER MASCHF, et al) [X] 1 * see the whole document *; | [X]US1991716 (WISE WOOD HENRY A) [X] 1,2,4,5 * see the whole document *; | [X]US5511712 (HOLM HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 38; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6142074 (FLAMENT DANIEL [FR]) [A] * figures 1-4; claims 1-3 * | Examination | US3281043 | US4165843 |