EP1316622 - Method and apparatus for heat treating material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabinovich, Albert 1129 Farmington Avenue West Hartford, CT 06107 / US | 02 /
Ward, William J. Jr. 38 South Stonybrook Drive Marlborough, CT 06447 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2003/23] | Leckey, David H. Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258205.0 | 28.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | US20010683185 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: US 683185 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316622 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1316622 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316622 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/667, C21D9/00, C21D1/613, F27B5/16 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C21D9/0068 (EP,US);
C21D1/667 (EP,US);
C22F1/10 (EP,US);
C21D2221/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/23] | C21D1/667, C21D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wärmebehandeln von Werkstücken | [2003/23] | English: | Method and apparatus for heat treating material | [2003/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement thermique de pièces | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 14.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | BE | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | IT | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | IE | 28.11.2008 | LU | 28.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | FR | 08.12.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | ES | 19.01.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | [2012/08] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CY | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
LU | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CY | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
LU | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CY | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
LU | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
LU | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 19.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]USH777H (NATARAJAN MANI) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 17 - line 23 * * column 3, line 1 - line 15 * * column 3, line 35 - line 52 * * column 11, line 57 - line 65 * * figures 2,4,6,9 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US5452882 (WUNNING JOACHIM [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * column 4, line 42 - line 67 *; | [A]EP1108793 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]); | [XP]US6394793 (BUNGE GENE [US]) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | US3515601 |