Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
31.03.2006 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
25.03.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
25.03.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
01.12.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.11.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.08.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
19.04.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.04.2005 | Deletion: Reply to examination report | |
18.03.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
16.02.2005 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
16.02.2005 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
12.11.2004 | First examination report | |
10.11.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.11.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.10.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
03.09.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
30.01.2004 | Publication of search report | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
18.04.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |