Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4002751B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2007 | B2 | JP2003166651 | 13.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001366325 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1316747 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2006 | B1 | EP1316747 | 17.03.2004 | A3 | EP1316747 | 04.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001366325 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60211454T | 16.05.2007 | T2 | DE60211454D1 | 22.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001366325 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6758476 | 06.07.2004 | B2 | US2003102631 | 05.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001366325 | 30.11.2001 |