EP1316747 - Mechanical seal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states EAGLE INDUSTRY Co., Ltd. 12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states EAGLE INDUSTRY Co., Ltd. 12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Hidekazu, Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK RAWORTH HOUSE 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258230.8 | 29.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | JP20010366325 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001366325 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316747 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1316747 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316747 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
F16J15/3488 (EP,US);
F16J15/3464 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gleitringdichtungsanordnung | [2003/23] | English: | Mechanical seal device | [2003/23] | French: | Garniture mécanique d'étanchéité | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1101882 (US METALLIC PACKING COMPANY LT, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 7, lines 38-57 * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]DE1269852 (FILTON LTD) [Y] 5 * column 3, lines 5-8 * * column 4, lines 25-37 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5188377 (DRUMM KEVIN R [CA]) [A] 1,5 * column 7, lines 49-55 ** figures 2-5 *; | [XY]US5199720 (RADOSAV JON J [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, lines 62-68 * * column 5, lines 8-24 * * column 6, lines 9-14 * * column 6, lines 57-60 * * column 15, lines 2-10 * * figures 4A,4C,5C,6,7,9 * [Y] 5; | [A]US5913520 (CLARK MARLEN S [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * figure 2 * |